CT HB05432 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 639
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 639
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require, in odd-numbered years, that a proposed statement of estimated revenue be reported by the committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to finance, revenue and bonding prior to the reporting of certain appropriations bills by the committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to appropriations and the budgets of state agencies.
Title
An Act Concerning The Reporting Deadlines Of Certain Joint Standing Committees Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | File Number 639 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Calendar Number 419 |
2018-04-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |