CT HB05422 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the use of natural alternatives to magnesium chloride for melting ice on state highways.
Title
An Act Requiring The Use Of Natural Alternatives To Magnesium Chloride For Melting Ice On State Highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-09 | House | File Number 21 |
2017-03-09 | House | House Calendar Number 49 |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-01-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |