CT HB05419 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - File Number 688
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - File Number 688
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit operation of the personal screening system that was instituted in the Legislative Office Building and at the State Capitol in 2014 unless certain requirements are met, and to allow legislators access to the chambers of the House of Representatives and the Senate with their identification cards.
Title
An Act Concerning Operation Of The Personal Screening System In The Legislative Office Building And At The State Capitol And Allowing Legislators Access To The Chambers Of The House Of Representatives And Senate Using Their Identification Cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | File Number 688 |
2016-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 427 |
2016-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/16 5:00 PM |
2016-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |