CT HB05416 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To raise the threshold for what constitutes a community water system.
Title
An Act Concerning The Threshold For The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection's Review Of Alternative Treatment Septic Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-03-07 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |