CT HB05413 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Public Hearing 03/02
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Public Hearing 03/02
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require all revenue collected from new types of gaming established in the state be dedicated to the Teachers' Retirement Fund, until said fund is fully funded.
Title
An Act Dedicating Revenue From New Types Of Gaming To The Teachers' Retirement Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |