CT HB05409 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - File Number 241
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - File Number 241
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create uniform criteria for the issuance of a temporary state permit to carry a pistol or revolver.
Title
An Act Concerning Application Requirements For A Temporary State Permit To Carry A Pistol Or A Revolver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | File Number 241 |
2016-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 184 |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |