CT HB05397 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To shorten the time period that tenants are without essential services provided by landlords.
Title
An Act Concerning The Provision Of Essential Services By Landlords.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 189 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 154 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |