CT HB05395 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Senate Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To revise the environmental justice law in order to better serve the municipalities and communities that it is intended to benefit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring An Evaluation Of The State's Environmental Justice Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 118 (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSenate Calendar Number 501
2019-05-16HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-14HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-15HouseFile Number 649
2019-04-15HouseHouse Calendar Number 394
2019-04-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-15HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-13HousePublic Hearing 03/18
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-03-11HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback