CT HB05394 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - Public Hearing 02/15
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the trade of ivory and rhinoceros horn if it was taken from the wild after February 26, 1976, while also preserving the state's antiques industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Sale And Trade Of Ivory And Rhinoceros Horn In The State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-18HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback