CT HB05394 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require smoke and carbon monoxide detection and warning equipment in all residential buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Smoke And Carbon Monoxide Detectors And Alarms In Residential Dwellings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 403 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 396 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2012-06-01 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2012-05-30 Public Act 12-184
2012-05-09 On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2012-05-09 Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-09 Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-09 Rules Suspended
2012-05-09 Senate Calendar Number 528
2012-05-09 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-05-08 Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2012-05-08 On Consent Calendar
2012-05-08 House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-08 House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5417
2012-03-29 File Number 188
2012-03-29 House Calendar Number 155
2012-03-29 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-03-29 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-23 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM
2012-03-15 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-15 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-03-02 Public Hearing 03/06
2012-03-01 Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback