CT HB05394 | 2010 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - File Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To increase the allowable amount of state funds in the Budget Reserve Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Amount Of Unappropriated Surplus Deposited In The Budget Reserve Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-13 File Number 493
2010-04-13 House Calendar Number 295
2010-04-13 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2010-04-13 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-04-06 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM
2010-03-29 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2010-03-25 Joint Favorable
2010-03-01 Public Hearing 03/05
2010-02-26 Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback