CT HB05391 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 366
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Transportation to conduct studies and satisfy other requirements pursuant to the National Environmental Policy Act for the purposes of developing electronic tolling systems on the highways of this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Preparation Of A Tolling Proposal And Support For Transportation Infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseFile Number 366
2018-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 240
2018-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback