CT HB05390 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 365
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To allow a person who applies for a public passenger endorsement to operate a school bus, while the application is pending, to operate a school bus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Criminal History Records Checks For Operators Of School Buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseFile Number 365
2018-04-10HouseHouse Calendar Number 239
2018-04-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-10HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback