CT HB05388 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To add investigators in the Division of Public Defender Services and support service investigators to the definition of "hazardous duty member" for purposes of the State Employees Retirement Act.
Title
An Act Concerning Hazard Pensions For Certain Judicial Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | House | File Number 286 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 203 |
2024-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |