CT HB05387 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Insurance Commissioner to adopt regulations establishing continuing education requirements for public adjusters.
Title
An Act Concerning Continuing Education Requirements For Public Adjusters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 507 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | File Number 335 |
2022-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 247 |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |