CT HB05386 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 553
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit the sale of animals originating from puppy mills at Connecticut pet shops.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Sale Or Transfer Of Dogs, Cats And Rabbits At Pet Shops That Are Not From Animal Welfare Organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseFile Number 553
2019-04-09HouseHouse Calendar Number 335
2019-04-09HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-09HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22HousePublic Hearing 03/01
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-11HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback