CT HB05386 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Senate Calendar Number 387
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To classify as "unassigned" the multiple votes an elector may cast on the ballot for cross endorsed candidates and make technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Votes For Cross Endorsed Candidates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 37 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14HouseSenate Calendar Number 387
2016-04-14HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-12HouseHouse Passed
2016-03-31HouseFile Number 347
2016-03-31HouseHouse Calendar Number 241
2016-03-31HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-03-31HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-24HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-11HouseJoint Favorable
2016-02-25HousePublic Hearing 02/29
2016-02-24HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback