CT HB05385 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce litter in parks, waterways and urban areas and to create cost savings in the recycling process.
Title
An Act Requiring The Elimination Of Single-use Plastic Straws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2019-05-29 | House | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 7830 |
2019-04-09 | House | File Number 552 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Calendar Number 334 |
2019-04-09 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-06 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-03-04 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |