CT HB05382 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To adopt the most recent amendments made by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners to the Model Insurance Holding Company Act regarding group capital calculation.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurance Holding Company Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 66 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate |
2022-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 429 |
2022-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-29 | House | File Number 171 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 162 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |