CT HB05381 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require that electric suppliers and certain electric distribution companies demonstrate that a certain amount of their output or services are generated from Class II renewable energy sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Renewable Portfolio Standard For Class Ii Renewable Energy Sources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-12HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-02-26HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing 02/21
2019-02-05HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback