CT HB05380 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 587
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 587
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study potential cost savings from the utilization of mobility systems and other technology for persons who receive state financial assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Cost Savings From The Utilization Of Mobility Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 234 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | House | Senate Calendar Number 587 |
2016-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5893 |
2016-03-23 | House | File Number 148 |
2016-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 130 |
2016-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |