CT HB05379 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Senate Calendar Number 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise or repeal certain election administration statutes concerning (1) admission of electors and maintenance of registry list, (2) training of certain election officials, (3) residential status of tabulator tenders, and (4) delivery of election returns to the Secretary of the State, town clerks and registrars of voters.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Election Administration Procedures Related To Registrars Of Voters.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 59 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 415 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 495 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 349 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |