CT HB05378 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 434
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Senate Calendar Number 434
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act of the residential addresses of employees of the office of the Attorney General.
Title
An Act Concerning The Nondisclosure Of The Residential Addresses Of Certain Employees Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 70 (Y: 111 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 434 |
2022-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-13 | House | File Number 459 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 339 |
2022-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |