CT HB05376 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the reasons for granting payment of attorneys' fees by the state to an aggrieved respondent under the code of ethics for public officials.
Title
An Act Concerning Recovery Of Attorneys' Fees Under The State Code Of Ethics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | No Action |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 494 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 348 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |