CT HB05374 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Senate Recommitted to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a commission to commemorate the two hundred and fiftieth anniversary of the American Revolution.
Title
An Act Establishing A Commission To Commemorate The United States Of America Semiquincentennial.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Mark Anderson [R] | Rep. Stephanie Thomas [D] |
Rep. Laura Devlin [R] | Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] | Rep. Donna Veach [R] | Rep. Irene Haines [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 38 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Senate Recommitted to Commerce |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 370 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | House Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | File Number 283 |
2022-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 214 |
2022-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |