CT HB05374 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to submit a progress report to the General Assembly on the steps the Department of Children and Families has taken to comply with the recommendations contained in the 2014 Legislative Program Review and Investigations report on services to prepare youths aging out of state care.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee Study On The Department Of Children And Families As They Relate To Preparation Of Youths Aging Out Of State Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 310 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 86 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-09 | House | Special Act 14-8 |
2014-05-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Passed |
2014-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 471 |
2014-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House Passed |
2014-04-10 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Human Services |
2014-03-31 | House | File Number 208 |
2014-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 136 |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |