CT HB05372 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow clinical social workers to conduct periodic behavioral health assessments of police officers, and (2) recognize the increased use of clinical social workers by law enforcement units when issuing emergency certificates.
Title
An Act Concerning Periodic Behavioral Health Assessments, Police Officer Recruitment, School Resource Officers, Reporting Of Violations To The Police Officer Standards And Training Council, Investigations By The Inspector General, Minimum Standards And Practices For The Administration, Management And Operation Of Law Enforcement Units And The Correction Advisory Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 397 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 191 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 22-114 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 555 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-03 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6334 |
2022-04-22 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-22 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 493 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 347 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |