CT HB05368 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To revise certain statutes concerning the composition and organizational structure of the Governor's Guards.
Title
An Act Concerning The Governor's Guards, Certain Military Department Moneys And A Military Funeral Honors Ribbon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 344 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 181 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 22-62 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 553 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-02 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | File Number 206 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 188 |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |