CT HB05365 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide legal protections to a person who enters the vehicle of another to rescue a child who is reasonably believed to be in imminent danger of serious bodily injury.
Title
An Act Concerning Legal Protections For Persons Entering Cars To Render Emergency Assistance To Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 609 |
2016-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-04 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 344 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 238 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-25 | House | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |