CT HB05364 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To restore disbursements to the Tobacco and Health Trust Fund to be used to reduce tobacco and substance abuse.
Title
An Act Concerning The Tobacco Settlement Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | House | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 154 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 145 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |