CT HB05364 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the taking of horseshoe crabs at certain locations in Stratford and require recommendations concerning the protection of horseshoe crabs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Protection Of Horseshoe Crabs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 349 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 33 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | House | Public Act 18-112 |
2018-05-09 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Passed |
2018-04-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 306 |
2018-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 80 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 94 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |