CT HB05359 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require any regulations concerning shellfish leases to be adopted in accordance with the Uniform Administrative Procedure Act and submitted to the General Assembly for approval.
Title
An Act Concerning Shellfish Leases And Designated Shellfish Parcels For The Development Of An Environmental Education Curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 312 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5985 |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 248 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 181 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |