CT HB05355 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - File Number 77
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish certain requirements for what constitutes adequate shelter for a dog during adverse weather conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing Standards For The Adequacy Of Dog Shelter During Extreme Weather Conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseFile Number 77
2018-03-28HouseHouse Calendar Number 91
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-03-28HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-14HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-02HousePublic Hearing 03/09
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback