CT HB05354 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To permit the Freedom of Information Commission to grant relief from vexatious requesters to public agencies.
Title
An Act Concerning Appeals Under The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-03-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |