CT HB05353 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - No Action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require certain employers to provide advance notice to certain employees of the employees' work schedule.
Title
An Act Concerning A Fair Work Week Schedule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | No Action |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-05 | House | File Number 297 |
2022-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 227 |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |