CT HB05347 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 536
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 536
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize state grant commitments for school building projects and make revisions to the school building project statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Authorization Of State Grant Commitments For School Building Projects And Revisions To The School Building Projects Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | File Number 536 |
2024-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 362 |
2024-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |