CT HB05341 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include school bus drivers in the list of persons protected from liability for administering medication to a student.
Title
An Act Providing Immunity From Liability For School Bus Drivers Who May Administer Epinephrine To A Student In An Emergency Situation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 244 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 177 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |