CT HB05339 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Senate Calendar Number 563
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Senate Calendar Number 563
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to study issues affecting public schools.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 AS AMENDED (Y: 104 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 563 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5960 |
2018-03-29 | House | File Number 128 |
2018-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 103 |
2018-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |