CT HB05336 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require licensed youth camp employees who are eighteen years of age or older to submit to a comprehensive background check.
Title
An Act Requiring Background Checks For Certain Employees Of Licensed Youth Camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |