CT HB05333 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) the Department of Public Health to administer the national Youth Risk Behavior Survey, (2) high schools to participate in the survey, if selected, and (3) the Child Advocate to develop questions assessing the risk to youths of being victims of sexual assault or misconduct by an adult.
Title
An Act Concerning The Centers For Disease Control And Prevention Youth Risk Behavior Survey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-28 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |