CT HB05327 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require certain residential restoration service providers to register as home improvement contractors.
Title
An Act Requiring Certain Residential Restoration Service Providers To Register As Home Improvement Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 214 AS AMENDED (Y: 132 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 225 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 229 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 19 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-09 | House | Public Act 16-35 |
2016-05-02 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-28 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-28 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | House | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4293 |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 374 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-08 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-21 | House | File Number 65 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 82 |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |