CT HB05326 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - File Number 329
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - File Number 329
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To mandate procedures that residential solar photovoltaic systems providers and agents of such providers must follow when conducting residential solar photovoltaic systems solicitations and to require solar companies to respond promptly to buyers and sellers during real estate transactions.
Title
An Act Concerning Residential Solar Photovoltaic Systems Solicitations And Real Estate Transactions Involving Solar.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | File Number 329 |
2022-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 241 |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |