CT HB05325 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Vote to Draft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

To inform local and regional school districts of the ability to apply for funds from the school bus seat belt account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Informing School Districts Of The School Bus Seat Belt Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01HouseVote to Draft
2017-01-26HousePublic Hearing 01/30
2017-01-23HouseReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-09HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Transportation

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback