CT HB05324 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To restrict the placement of leghold traps within one thousand five hundred feet of areas where children are likely to encounter such devices.
Title
An Act Concerning Child Safety By Restricting The Placement Of Leghold Traps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | |
2012-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Environment | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |