CT HB05324 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-21 - Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce opportunities for identity theft by ensuring that a photostatic copy of a person's driver's license is not part of the person's health care record.
Title
An Act Prohibiting A Health Care Provider From Including A Copy Of A Person's Driver's License In The Person's Health Care Records.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Mikutel [D] | Rep. Melissa Olson [D] | House Public Health Committee | Rep. Elizabeth Ritter [D] |
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] | Sen. Andrea Stillman [D] | Rep. Elissa Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |
2011-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | |
2011-02-15 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |