CT HB05324 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 560
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-03 - Senate Calendar Number 560
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a process for possible divestment of state funds from companies doing business in Iran and to make conforming changes to the statute concerning divestment of state funds from companies doing business in Sudan.
Title
An Act Concerning Divestment Of State Funds Invested In Companies Doing Business In Iran And Sudan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 560 | |
2010-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2010-05-03 | House Passed | |
2010-03-23 | File Number 107 | |
2010-03-23 | House Calendar Number 78 | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |