CT HB05318 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Calendar Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Senate Calendar Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow surplus vehicles from the state motor pool to be provided to veterans' charitable organizations for donation to certain disabled combat veterans with a demonstrated need for financial assistance.
Title
An Act Concerning The Offering Of Certain Motor Vehicles From The State Motor Pool To Qualified Veterans' Charitable Organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 254 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 551 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5579 |
2018-03-28 | House | File Number 72 |
2018-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 86 |
2018-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |