CT HB05316 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 133
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a farmers' retirement savings trust.
Title
An Act Establishing A Farmers' Retirement Savings Trust.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Maria Horn [D] |
Rep. Brian Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | File Number 133 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 142 |
2022-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |