CT HB05316 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Senate Calendar Number 467
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Senate Calendar Number 467
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent boards of education from assigning low-performing students, students with behavioral problems and students who are over age for their grades in public high schools to adult education programs.
Title
An Act Amending The Definition Of Resident Students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Senate Calendar Number 467 | |
2010-04-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | House Passed | |
2010-04-12 | File Number 449 | |
2010-04-12 | House Calendar Number 254 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |