CT HB05315 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - File Number 671
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-27 - File Number 671
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Financial Wellness Trust Fund and to authorize the Treasurer to establish a Center for Financial Wellness.
Title
An Act Establishing A Financial Wellness Trust Fund And Authorizing The Treasurer To Establish A Center For Financial Wellness.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. Bobby Gibson [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 103 AS AMENDED (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | File Number 671 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 502 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5336 |
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | House | File Number 165 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 156 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |